Financial history THE VIRGIN MONEY FOUNDATION

Charity number: 1161290
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 30/09/2020 30/09/2021 30/09/2022
Total gross income £2.43m £1.57m £1.60m £2.05m £1.88m
Total expenditure £2.45m £1.85m £1.31m £1.98m £1.73m
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £1.00m N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies £2.42m £1.56m £1.59m £2.05m £1.88m
Income - Other trading activities £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Charitable activities £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £11.00k £12.40k £10.80k £0 £0
Income - Other £0 £0 £0 £4.00k £2.50k
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £2.45m £1.85m £1.31m £1.98m £1.73m
Expenditure - Raising funds £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Governance £158.00k £156.20k £103.50k £167.00k £94.70k
Expenditure - Grants institution £2.00m £1.42m £984.20k £1.81m £1.28m
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0