SOUTH DOWNS LEISURE

Charity number: 1163564
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/03/2016 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020
Total gross income £5.88m £6.63m £6.53m £6.94m £6.57m
Total expenditure £5.47m £6.45m £6.55m £6.52m £6.66m
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £15.72k £6.19k £18.44k £10.17k
Income - Donations and legacies £128.89k £130.39k £38 £31.41k £21.38k
Income - Other trading activities £0 £0 £0 £515.80k £565.06k
Income - Charitable activities £5.75m £6.43m £6.46m £0 £5.98m
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Other £0 £62.71k £72.53k £0 £0
Income - Legacies £0 £130.39k £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £5.46m £6.45m £6.55m £6.09m £6.11m
Expenditure - Raising funds £0 £0 £0 £431.99k £548.68k
Expenditure - Governance £10.93k £36.80k £41.57k £0 £24.97k
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0