Financial history THE CHILDREN'S BOOKSHOW

Charity number: 1162410
Charity reporting is overdue by 31 days
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/03/2021 31/03/2022
Total gross income £134.72k £140.95k £130.30k £146.20k £175.28k
Total expenditure £134.08k £141.76k £138.39k £151.96k £168.11k
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A £68.96k £114.52k £73.45k