Trustees THE CHILDREN'S BOOKSHOW

Charity number: 1162410
Charity reporting is overdue by 25 days

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

8 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Claire Boulton Chair 01 April 2020
None on record
Sinead Salatchi Naidoo Trustee 14 July 2021
None on record
Errol Daly Lloyd Trustee 14 July 2021
None on record
Robina Pelham Burn Trustee 16 October 2019
Beyond Detention
Received: On time
Shoshannah Thompson Trustee 28 March 2017
None on record
SIAN WILLIAMS Trustee 07 March 2016
None on record
Kate Arafa Trustee 07 March 2016
None on record
DAVID POTTER Trustee 01 June 2015
None on record