Accounts and annual returns GIFT FOR AFRICA

Charity number: 1160654
Charity reporting is overdue by 366 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2022 Overdue Overdue by 1 days
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022 Overdue Overdue by 1 days
Annual return 31 March 2021 Overdue Overdue by 366 days
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 Overdue Overdue by 366 days
Annual return 31 March 2020 15 July 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 15 July 2020 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2019 15 July 2020 166 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019 15 July 2020 166 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2018 15 July 2020 531 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2018 15 July 2020 531 days late Download Open in new window