Financial history GIFT FOR AFRICA

Charity number: 1160654
Charity reporting is overdue by 373 days
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2016 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020
Total gross income £800 £0 £0 £0 £0
Total expenditure £800 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A