TAVISTOCK ARTS EDUCATION TRUST

Charity number: 1160780
Charity reporting is up to date
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
31/03/2016 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020
Total income £0 £0 £0 £1.00k £0
Total expenditure £0 £3.02k £0 £979 £0