Accounts and annual returns THE FRANCIS SKARYNA BELARUSIAN LIBRARY AND MUSEUM

Charity number: 1161434
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2021 10 January 2022 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2020 01 April 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 01 April 2021 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2019 13 January 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2018 27 January 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2018 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2017 10 February 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2017 Not Required