Financial history THE FRANCIS SKARYNA BELARUSIAN LIBRARY AND MUSEUM

Charity number: 1161434
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021
Total gross income £14.48k £14.82k £17.58k £28.97k £17.03k
Total expenditure £20.70k £6.46k £8.50k £15.07k £32.14k
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A £10.00k N/A