Trustees THE FRANCIS SKARYNA BELARUSIAN LIBRARY AND MUSEUM

Charity number: 1161434
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

6 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Rev Ihar Labacevic Trustee 03 May 2021
None on record
ELENA EDWARDS Trustee 09 June 2019
SCIENCE AROUND US FOUNDATION
Received: On time
REV STASIEVICH Trustee 18 October 2014
None on record
DR KRYVOI Trustee 08 February 2014
None on record
DR MATSKEVICH Trustee 09 February 2000
None on record
MR SHEVTSOV Trustee 12 October 1999
None on record