Accounts and annual returns FLAME SPIRIT GOLF SOCIETY

Charity number: 1164289
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 06 April 2021 25 January 2022 On time
Accounts and TAR 06 April 2021 Not Required
Annual return 06 April 2020 25 October 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 06 April 2020 Not Required
Annual return 06 April 2019 25 October 2020 262 days late
Accounts and TAR 06 April 2019 Not Required
Annual return 06 April 2018 25 October 2020 627 days late
Accounts and TAR 06 April 2018 Not Required
Annual return 06 April 2017 06 February 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 06 April 2017 Overdue Overdue by 1691 days