Financial history FLAME SPIRIT GOLF SOCIETY

Charity number: 1164289
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 06/04/2017 06/04/2018 06/04/2019 06/04/2020 06/04/2021
Total gross income £39.12k £23.21k £21.39k £21.11k £11.09k
Total expenditure £39.81k £22.74k £21.75k £21.03k £10.65k
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A