BE BALD BE BEAUTIFUL

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Information on the charity's activities is not available.
What, who, how, where
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- Recreation
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 18 August 2015: CIO registration
No other names
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
ALEXANDRA CORKER | Chair |
|
|
|||||
TIMOTHY BROWN | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
CHARLOTTE EVANS | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 209 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 209 days | |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 575 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 575 days | |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 940 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 940 days | |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 1305 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 1305 days | |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 1670 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 1670 days |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - Foundation Registered 18 Aug 2015
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE THE RELIEF OF SICKNESS AND THE PRESERVATION OF PHYSICAL AND MENTAL HEALTH OF SUFFERERS OF CANCER THROUGH THE PROVISION OF SUPPORT, EDUCATION AND PRACTICAL ADVICE AND THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES FOR WORK AND RECREATION.
Contact information
- Address:
-
30 Forster Road
Guildford
GU2 9AF
- Phone:
- 07725911900
- Email:
- No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window