DIVERSITY VOICE

Charity number: 1162019
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/03/2016 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020
Total gross income £167.88k £110.01k £168.15k £168.15k £230.43k
Total expenditure £66.36k £106.31k £133.89k £133.89k £191.40k
Income from government contracts £40.00k £98.00k £145.43k £95.62k £84.21k
Income from government grants £18.00k £0 £0 N/A £27.57k