Accounts and annual returns HULL BOXING CENTRE

Charity number: 1161418
Charity reporting is overdue by 631 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2022 Overdue Overdue by 266 days
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2022 Overdue Overdue by 266 days
Annual return 31 December 2021 Overdue Overdue by 631 days
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021 Overdue Overdue by 631 days
Annual return 31 December 2020 31 October 2022 365 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 31 October 2022 365 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2019 13 November 2020 13 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 13 November 2020 13 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2018 01 November 2019 1 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2018 01 November 2019 1 days late Download Open in new window