Financial history HULL BOXING CENTRE

Charity number: 1161418
Charity reporting is overdue by 621 days
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020
Total gross income £47.61k £50.91k £23.75k £38.68k £13.10k
Total expenditure £50.67k £49.12k £22.43k £42.00k £9.70k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A £11.97k