NUTMEG COMMUNITY

Charity number: 1162443
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2020 06 February 2021 6 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2019 26 January 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2018 21 February 2019 21 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2018 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2017 21 December 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2017 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2016 13 November 2016 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2016 13 November 2016 On time Download