NUTMEG COMMUNITY

Charity number: 1162443
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/03/2016 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020
Total gross income £89.61k £1.10k £6.00k £520 £390
Total expenditure £92.20k £24.91k £1.94k £5.91k £426
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £6.00k N/A N/A N/A N/A