WILSTEAD JUBILEE CENTRE

Charity number: 1162106
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/03/2016 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020
Total gross income £4.18k £3.34k £4.53k £5.97k £5.14k
Total expenditure £6.73k £6.58k £5.86k £8.22k £7.51k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 £94 £1.12k N/A