THE DAN-Y-COED COMMUNITY ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 505875
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2021 01 October 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2020 26 March 2021 54 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2019 25 August 2020 207 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2018 30 October 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2018 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2017 22 February 2018 22 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2017 Not Required