THE DAN-Y-COED COMMUNITY ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 505875
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021
Total gross income £6.01k £6.33k £7.81k £16.04k £14.39k
Total expenditure £8.25k £7.01k £7.64k £7.42k £22.49k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A £10.00k