THE ELMHURST FOUNDATION

Charity number: 1163539
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 30/04/2016 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020
Total gross income £5.00k £3.40m £3.18m £3.70m £3.41m
Total expenditure £8.49k £294.12k £3.09m £3.16m £3.33m
Income from government contracts N/A £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A £0 N/A N/A £22.48k
Income - Donations and legacies N/A £3.22m £843.05k £1.54m £1.15m
Income - Other trading activities N/A £184.19k £2.34m £2.17m £2.23m
Income - Charitable activities N/A £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Endowments N/A £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment N/A £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Other N/A £0 £0 £0 £22.48k
Income - Legacies N/A £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities N/A £50.65k £28.69k £3.16m £114.98k
Expenditure - Raising funds N/A £243.47k £3.06m £0 £3.22m
Expenditure - Governance N/A £0 £0 £10.89k £114.98k
Expenditure - Grants institution N/A £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management N/A £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other N/A £0 £0 £0 £0