RICHMOND DUTCH SCHOOL

Charity number: 1162146
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 July 2019 09 May 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2019 09 May 2020 On time Download
Annual return 31 July 2018 05 March 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2018 Not Required
Annual return 31 July 2017 19 June 2018 19 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2017 19 June 2018 19 days late Download
Annual return 31 July 2016 29 May 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2016 29 May 2017 On time Download