Accounts and annual returns JUSTICE IN PRISONS
Charity number: 1170809

Charity reporting is overdue by 1399 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 04 February 2022 | Overdue | Overdue by 303 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 04 February 2022 | Overdue | Overdue by 303 days | |
Annual return | 04 February 2021 | Overdue | Overdue by 668 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 04 February 2021 | Overdue | Overdue by 668 days | |
Annual return | 04 February 2020 | Overdue | Overdue by 1033 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 04 February 2020 | Overdue | Overdue by 1033 days | |
Annual return | 04 February 2019 | Overdue | Overdue by 1399 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 04 February 2019 | Overdue | Overdue by 1399 days | |
Annual return | 04 February 2018 | 08 February 2019 | 66 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 04 February 2018 | 10 February 2019 | 68 days late | Download Open in new window |
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Was this page useful?
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window