Financial history CASE COMMUNITY TRUST

Charity number: 1166966
Charity reporting is up to date (8 days late)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021
Total gross income £0 £5.30m £173.00k £6.43m £429.95k
Total expenditure £7.11k £41.74k £138.35k £342.08k £286.58k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A £43.15k
Income - Donations and legacies N/A £5.27m N/A £6.13m N/A
Income - Other trading activities N/A £0 N/A £5.83k N/A
Income - Charitable activities N/A £0 N/A £0 N/A
Income - Endowments N/A £5.27m N/A £0 N/A
Income - Investment N/A £26.61k N/A £283.83k N/A
Income - Other N/A £0 N/A £3.49k N/A
Income - Legacies N/A £0 N/A £0 N/A
Expenditure - Charitable activities N/A £35.30k N/A £295.59k N/A
Expenditure - Raising funds N/A £6.44k N/A £46.48k N/A
Expenditure - Governance N/A £9.15k N/A £0 N/A
Expenditure - Grants institution N/A £0 N/A £0 N/A
Expenditure - Investment management N/A £4.79k N/A £0 N/A
Expenditure - Other N/A £0 N/A £0 N/A