Trustees CASE COMMUNITY TRUST

Charity number: 1166966
Charity reporting is up to date (8 days late)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

8 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
KEVIN MARK COLLINS Chair 06 July 2015
THE GRACE COOK TRUST FUND
Received: On time
Helen Amy Jude Brind Trustee 22 September 2020
None on record
Alison Jackson Trustee 21 October 2019
None on record
Simon Matthew Patterson Trustee 01 October 2019
None on record
Robert Corken Gray Trustee 13 May 2019
None on record
David Andrew Bent Trustee 22 October 2018
None on record
Mark Peter Russell Trustee 25 September 2018
None on record
STEVEN BAIRD Trustee 09 May 2016
None on record