Accounts and annual returns THE NEIL AND ALISON OSTRER FOUNDATION

Charity number: 1161036
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2022 16 December 2022 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022 16 December 2022 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2021 10 May 2022 99 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 10 May 2022 99 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2020 02 February 2021 2 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 02 February 2021 2 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2019 27 January 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019 27 January 2020 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2018 28 January 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2018 28 January 2019 On time Download Open in new window