Financial history THE ADVOCACY ACADEMY

Charity number: 1161785
Charity reporting is overdue by 200 days
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2016 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020
Total gross income £34.00k £57.53k £137.35k £307.52k £823.43k
Total expenditure £23.66k £56.61k £106.61k £242.29k £463.53k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £1.00k £0 N/A N/A £16.50k
Income - Donations and legacies N/A N/A N/A N/A £743.30k
Income - Other trading activities N/A N/A N/A N/A £0
Income - Charitable activities N/A N/A N/A N/A £80.13k
Income - Endowments N/A N/A N/A N/A £743.30k
Income - Investment N/A N/A N/A N/A £0
Income - Other N/A N/A N/A N/A £0
Income - Legacies N/A N/A N/A N/A £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities N/A N/A N/A N/A £416.56k
Expenditure - Raising funds N/A N/A N/A N/A £46.98k
Expenditure - Governance N/A N/A N/A N/A £221
Expenditure - Grants institution N/A N/A N/A N/A £0
Expenditure - Investment management N/A N/A N/A N/A £0
Expenditure - Other N/A N/A N/A N/A £0