THE ADVOCACY ACADEMY

Charity number: 1161785

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

12 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Natalie Armitage Trustee 31 May 2020 None on record
Layal Marten Trustee 16 April 2018 None on record
Zoe Tyndall Trustee 17 January 2017 None on record
Rachel Diamond-Hunter Trustee 31 May 2020 None on record
Ruth Pryce Trustee 23 February 2020 None on record
Shivani Smith Chair 16 April 2018 None on record
Maha Sardar Trustee 09 May 2020 None on record
Thishani Nadesan Trustee 03 December 2018 None on record
Thalia Papanicolaou Trustee 31 May 2020 None on record
Constantinos Christou Trustee 31 May 2020 None on record
Michelle King Trustee 31 May 2020 None on record
Abimbola Wingate-Saul Trustee 09 May 2020 None on record