FRIENDS OF ST JOSEPH'S PTFA

Charity number: 1161293
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 August 2019 26 November 2020 149 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2019 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2018 25 November 2020 514 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2018 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2017 01 February 2019 216 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2017 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2016 28 June 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2016 Not Required