Accounts and annual returns COATES EDUCATIONAL FOUNDATION

Charity number: 505906
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2021 31 October 2022 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2020 28 October 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 29 October 2021 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2019 29 October 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2018 03 July 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2018 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2017 05 October 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2017 Not Required