Financial history COATES EDUCATIONAL FOUNDATION

Charity number: 505906
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021
Total gross income £24.42k £23.64k £24.08k £25.23k £24.27k
Total expenditure £4.68k £5.75k £5.40k £5.65k £35.35k
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A