KENT HOUSE PARENT TEACHER ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 1168393
Charity reporting is up to date (19 days late)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2019 19 November 2020 19 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 19 November 2020 19 days late Download
Annual return 31 December 2018 14 October 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2018 11 November 2019 11 days late Download
Annual return 31 December 2017 28 October 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2017 28 October 2018 On time Download