WHALLEY SPORTS COMMUNITY PARK

Charity number: 1161880
Charity reporting is up to date (9 days late)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2020 09 February 2021 9 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 09 February 2021 9 days late Download
Annual return 31 March 2019 30 January 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019 30 January 2020 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2018 30 January 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2018 30 January 2019 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2017 31 January 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2017 12 March 2018 40 days late Download
Annual return 31 March 2016 31 January 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2016 31 January 2017 On time Download