COCKERTON RESIDENTS' COMMUNITY ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 505924
Charity reporting is overdue by 121 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 September 2020 Overdue Overdue by 121 days
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2020 Overdue Overdue by 121 days
Annual return 30 September 2019 16 August 2020 17 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2019 Not Required
Annual return 30 September 2018 26 November 2019 119 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2018 Not Required
Annual return 30 September 2017 31 July 2018 1 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2017 Not Required
Annual return 30 September 2016 27 July 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2016 Not Required