COCKERTON RESIDENTS' COMMUNITY ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 505924
Charity reporting is overdue by 120 days
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 30/09/2015 30/09/2016 30/09/2017 30/09/2018 30/09/2019
Total gross income £8.93k £8.99k £8.85k £8.02k £10.03k
Total expenditure £12.16k £8.99k £8.85k £6.80k £7.71k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A