SOUTHAMPTON SWAYTHLING SPIRITUALIST CHURCH

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Conducting divine church services and healing services on a weekly basis, open to all. Open days and coffee mornings held on a monthly basis open to everyone, especially those in the local communities. Collecting food and toiletries for two charitable organisations - Two Saints day centre for homeless people and Second Chance animal sanctuary.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2021
People

6 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Hampshire
- Southampton City
Governance
- 27 May 2015: Standard registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
KIM JOHN WEBB | Chair | 14 April 1997 |
|
|
||||
Dawn Line | Trustee | 29 July 2024 |
|
|
||||
David Devine | Trustee | 23 May 2019 |
|
|
||||
Nigel Peter Bell | Trustee | 06 April 2018 |
|
|
||||
MAUREEN WEBB | Trustee | 01 April 2010 |
|
|
||||
RONALD PHILLIP LINSLEY | Trustee | 14 April 1997 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2017 | 31/12/2018 | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £3.69k | £4.09k | £4.14k | £1.24k | £1.43k | |
|
Total expenditure | £2.88k | £2.92k | £9.29k | £2.62k | £3.04k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 189 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 189 days | |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 555 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 555 days | |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 26 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 25 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 01 December 2020 | 31 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 01 DEC 2017
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS OF THE CHURCH ARE TO ADVANCE THE RELIGION AND THE RELIGIOUS PHILOSOPHY OF SPIRITUALISM ON THE BASIS OF THE SEVEN PRINCIPLES OF SPIRITUALISM.
Contact information
- Address:
-
186 WEST END ROAD
SOUTHAMPTON
SO18 6PN
- Phone:
- 02380485959
- Email:
- ronsdc@aol.com
- Website:
-
swaythlingspiritualistchurch.co.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window