Trustees CLWYD AREA SCOUT COUNCIL

Charity number: 505936
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

9 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
GARETH JONES Chair 24 May 2013
None on record
Adam Bakewell Trustee 10 September 2020
None on record
Simon Bannaghan Trustee 10 September 2020
None on record
Anne-Marie Roberts Trustee 10 September 2020
None on record
Gavin Scott Trustee 16 December 2019
None on record
JAKE MYATT Trustee 01 September 2016
THE WREXHAM MUSICAL THEATRE SOCIETY
Received: On time
THE SCOUT ASSOCIATION
Received: On time
John Stewart Trustee 01 April 2015
None on record
Arthur Elfed Gray-Jones Trustee 01 April 2015
None on record
EMILY CAROL BOUCHER Trustee 24 May 2013
None on record