Accounts and annual returns THE TIM HENMAN FOUNDATION

Charity number: 1161964
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 August 2021 28 January 2022 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2021 28 January 2022 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2020 08 June 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 08 June 2021 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2019 07 September 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 07 September 2020 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2018 08 October 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2018 08 October 2019 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2017 02 October 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2017 02 October 2018 On time Download Open in new window