Financial history THE TIM HENMAN FOUNDATION

Charity number: 1161964
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/08/2021 31/08/2022
Total gross income £569.20k £275.85k £182.89k £192.92k £275.70k
Total expenditure £357.50k £335.03k £228.20k £133.62k £150.95k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies £181.20k N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income - Other trading activities £387.47k N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income - Charitable activities £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income - Endowments £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income - Investment £533 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income - Other £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income - Legacies £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Expenditure - Charitable activities £113.10k N/A N/A N/A N/A
Expenditure - Raising funds £213.36k N/A N/A N/A N/A
Expenditure - Governance £27.33k N/A N/A N/A N/A
Expenditure - Grants institution £85.77k N/A N/A N/A N/A
Expenditure - Investment management £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Expenditure - Other £31.04k N/A N/A N/A N/A