BOURNE ELSEA PARK CHURCH OF ENGLAND PRIMARY ACADEMY PARENT TEACHERS AND FRIENDS ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 1163449
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 August 2020 30 June 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2019 30 June 2021 365 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2019 Not Required
Annual return 01 April 2018 26 April 2019 84 days late
Accounts and TAR 01 April 2018 Not Required
Annual return 01 April 2017 30 January 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 01 April 2017 Not Required
Annual return 01 April 2016 30 January 2018 363 days late
Accounts and TAR 01 April 2016 Not Required