Financial history ROMSEY AMATEUR OPERATIC AND DRAMATIC SOCIETY (RAODS)

Charity number: 1161097
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 01/05/2018 01/05/2019 01/05/2020 01/05/2021 01/05/2022
Total gross income £243.67k £274.77k £237.82k £73.22k £235.18k
Total expenditure £167.45k £209.32k £171.65k £57.35k £167.64k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £25.00k £18.71k £10.00k £21.46k N/A