WHITEHALL PSA

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Supporting Children and the wider local community
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 01 January 2024
People

6 Trustee(s)
11 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Waltham Forest
Governance
- 02 April 2015: Standard registration
No other names
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Jo Etherington | Trustee | 23 February 2024 |
|
|
||||
Lucy Morrison | Trustee | 23 February 2024 |
|
|
||||
Maria Wade | Trustee | 23 February 2024 |
|
|
||||
Reka Mills | Trustee | 23 February 2024 |
|
|
||||
Zakia Khatun | Trustee | 17 January 2020 |
|
|
||||
CARLY BLYTH | Trustee | 18 January 2014 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 01/01/2020 | 01/01/2021 | 01/01/2022 | 01/01/2023 | 01/01/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £15.85k | £1.51k | £15 | £12.43k | £11.43k | |
|
Total expenditure | £6.34k | £489 | £1.02k | £4.26k | £9.04k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 01 January 2024 | 18 January 2025 | 78 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 January 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 01 January 2023 | 04 March 2024 | 124 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 January 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 01 January 2022 | 25 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 January 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 01 January 2021 | 30 March 2022 | 149 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 January 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 01 January 2020 | 24 January 2021 | 84 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 January 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 12 JAN 2015
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF PUPILS IN THE SCHOOL IN PARTICULAR BY: DEVELOPING EFFECTIVE RELATIONSHIPS BETWEEN THE STAFF PARENTS AND OTHERS ASSOCIATED WITH THE SCHOOL; ENGAGING IN ACTIVITIES OR PROVIDING FACILITIES OR EQUIPMENT WHICH SUPPORT THE SCHOOL AND ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUPILS.
Contact information
- Address:
-
C/O Whitehall Primary School
90 Normanton Park
LONDON
E4 6ES
- Phone:
- 07957979953
- Email:
- No information available
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window