Accounts and annual returns INTERNATIONAL CHRISTIAN CENTRE FOR LEADERSHIP AND DEVELOPMENT

Charity number: 1161468
Charity reporting is overdue by 1535 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2023 Overdue Overdue by 74 days
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2023 Overdue Overdue by 74 days
Annual return 31 March 2022 Overdue Overdue by 439 days
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022 Overdue Overdue by 439 days
Annual return 31 March 2021 Overdue Overdue by 804 days
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 Overdue Overdue by 804 days
Annual return 31 March 2020 Overdue Overdue by 1169 days
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 Overdue Overdue by 1169 days
Annual return 31 March 2019 Overdue Overdue by 1535 days
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019 Overdue Overdue by 1535 days