Financial history HEWAD WELFARE

Charity number: 1162514
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/09/2017 30/09/2018 30/09/2019 30/09/2020 30/09/2021
Total gross income £11.05k £17.72k £15.04k £14.83k £5.97k
Total expenditure £8.56k £14.29k £7.53k £30.47k £2.36k
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A