HEWAD WELFARE

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
We organise community based gatherings which include celebrating religious festivals like Eid and cultural gatherings like celebrating the Afghan New Year and other gatherings. These gatherings are means of promoting communal harmony and social tolerance. Sometimes we arrange for basic Pashto (Afghan) Language classes for the young and the teachers are arranged for on a temporary basis when needed
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 September 2023
People

3 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Religious Activities
- Children/young People
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Services
- Throughout London
- Afghanistan
Governance
- 02 July 2015: Standard registration
- HAZARBOOZ WELFARE LIMITED (Previous name)
- HEWAD WELFARE LIMITED (Previous name)
- Complaints handling
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Abdul Ali Aziz | Trustee | 19 November 2021 |
|
|
||||
MOHAMMED AJMAL AZIZI | Trustee | 01 February 2021 |
|
|
||||
MAHAMED BASHIR | Trustee | 01 February 2021 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/09/2019 | 30/09/2020 | 30/09/2021 | 30/09/2022 | 30/09/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £15.04k | £14.83k | £5.97k | £5.53k | £1.50k | |
|
Total expenditure | £7.53k | £30.47k | £2.36k | £6.14k | £7.10k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 September 2023 | 25 June 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 September 2022 | 29 June 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 September 2021 | 05 April 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 September 2020 | 15 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 September 2019 | 31 December 2019 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 02 SEP 2014 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 05 JAN 2015 AS AMENDED BY CERTIFICATE OF INCORPORATION ON CHANGE OF NAME DATED 09 DEC 2016 as amended on 28 Aug 2019
Charitable objects
THE CHARITY'S OBJECTS ('OBJECTS') ARE SPECIFICALLY RESTRICTED TO THE FOLLOWING:- 1. THE ADVANCEMENT OF THE ISLAMIC RELIGION BY (BUT NOT LIMITED TO) PROVISION OF EID SERVICES (EID AL-FITTRE & EID-AL-ADZHA), FUNERAL SERVICES, NIKAAH (MARRIAGE) SERVICES, AFGHAN NEW YEAR CELEBRATION AND GATHERING SERVICES. 2. THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION BY PROVISION OF TAUGHT LANGUAGE COURSES IN PASHTO & DARI LANGUAGES TO CHILDREN AGED 5 TO 16 YEARS.
Contact information
- Address:
-
4 Beech Tree Close
STANMORE
Middlesex
HA7 4UB
- Phone:
- 07447455566
- Email:
- ajmaljan93@hotmail.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window