Financial history WECARE WORLDWIDE

Charity number: 1162386
Charity reporting is up to date (32 days late)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 17/09/2017 17/09/2018 31/08/2019 31/08/2020 31/08/2021
Total gross income £214.45k £158.56k £390.47k £320.27k £361.26k
Total expenditure £125.37k £144.36k £230.28k £243.26k £280.60k
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A