Accounts and annual returns OPTIONS 4 CHANGE

Charity number: 1162000
Charity reporting is overdue by 57 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 June 2021 Overdue Overdue by 57 days
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2021 Overdue Overdue by 57 days
Annual return 30 June 2020 16 April 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2020 16 April 2021 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 June 2019 27 April 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2019 27 April 2020 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 June 2018 29 April 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2018 29 April 2019 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 June 2017 29 April 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2017 29 April 2018 On time Download Open in new window