Financial history OPTIONS 4 CHANGE

Charity number: 1162000
Charity reporting is overdue by 22 days
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/06/2016 30/06/2017 30/06/2018 30/06/2019 30/06/2020
Total gross income £50.44k £55.73k £46.10k £40.66k £127.89k
Total expenditure £49.92k £51.44k £44.35k £45.40k £107.33k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A £10.00k