ACTIVE THERAPY FOUNDATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The ?Active Therapy Foundation? was formed to promote social inclusion, provide an innovative and dedicated coaching therapy programme and to make "Active therapy" available to all by promoting the skills of the members of the disabled community in such a way that they are better able to identify, and help meet their needs and to participate more fully in society.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 January 2024
People

9 Trustee(s)
40 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- People With Disabilities
- Provides Services
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 06 January 2016: Standard registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
9 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
MARC ROBERT HOWENS | Chair | 09 January 2015 |
|
|
||||
Beverley Anne Illidge | Trustee | 10 July 2022 |
|
|
||||
Keith James White | Trustee | 10 July 2022 |
|
|
||||
Ruth Brindle | Trustee | 10 July 2022 |
|
|
||||
CATHERINE SANDRA BRIOCHE | Trustee | 09 January 2015 |
|
|
||||
HARRY SANDY BRIOCHE | Trustee | 09 January 2015 |
|
|
||||
ANDREW GEORGE HARPER | Trustee | 09 January 2015 |
|
|
||||
JILLIAN LOFTHOUSE | Trustee | 09 January 2015 |
|
|
||||
DAVID THOMAS ROZZELL | Trustee | 09 January 2015 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/01/2020 | 31/01/2021 | 31/01/2022 | 31/01/2023 | 31/01/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £30.58k | £8.03k | £16.01k | £59.63k | £59.63k | |
|
Total expenditure | £30.20k | £8.59k | £13.59k | £39.10k | £39.10k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | £500 | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 January 2024 | 08 January 2025 | 39 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2024 | 08 January 2025 | 39 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 January 2023 | 03 January 2024 | 34 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2023 | 03 January 2024 | 34 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 January 2022 | 09 November 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 January 2021 | 23 November 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 January 2020 | 27 November 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2020 | 27 November 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 09 JAN 2015 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 06/01/2015
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE AND PROTECT THE GOOD HEALTH OF PERSONS SUFFERING FROM MENTAL AND / OR PHYSICAL DISABILITIES OF ANY DESCRIPTION OR IN NEED OF REHABILITATION AS A RESULT OF SUCH DISABILITIES, BY THE PROVISION OF PHYSICAL THERAPY PROGRAMMES AND FACILITIES FOR RECREATION.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
31 Stone Mason Crescent
Ormskirk
L39 2BN
- Phone:
- 07773409924
- Email:
- dave@activetf.co.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window